U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00683-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ACOSTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • December 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 07, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.