U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00672-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOEHRKE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 06, 2023: [Exclude]
  • January 06, 2023: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Errata]
  • February 22, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 07, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.