U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00151
  • Case Name: HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. v. LAW OFFICES OF PETER T. NICHOLL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Receipt and Acknowledgment of Transfer Papers]
  • January 13, 2022: [Case Transferred Out]
  • January 05, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • December 27, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • December 21, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • December 21, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 21, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 17, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 14, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of QC]
  • December 10, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 10, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 06, 2021: [Compel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Expedite]
  • December 06, 2021: [Transfer Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.