U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00712-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCLEAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Response to motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Reduce Sentence- USSC Amendment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • February 16, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Information - Felony]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 10, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.