U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:09-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CORREDOR-IBAGUE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
December, 2021
  • December 31, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • December 31, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 29, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 15, 2021: [Unseal Document]
  • December 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.