U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00719-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALLENGER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Response to motion]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 13, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 07, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • November 03, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 02, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 26, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • October 23, 2022: [Compel]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Reply in Support]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • July 20, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [In Limine ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 09, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • March 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 09, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.