U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00152
  • Case Name: GRAYSON v. NO LABELS, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 20, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 18, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 09, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Declaration]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of QC]
  • December 29, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 29, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 29, 2021: [Administrative Record]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Memorandum]
  • December 29, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • December 29, 2021: [Quash]
  • December 29, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Enforce ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • December 08, 2021: [Enforce]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.