U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00649-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOUGHNER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 16, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • December 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.