U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00224-2
  • Case Name: USA v. ALMONTE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Compel]
  • September 30, 2022: [Bill of Particulars ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • May 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 18, 2022: [Vacate]
  • April 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • April 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • April 11, 2022: [Vacate]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 22, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 09, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 07, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 27, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 21, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 20, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • December 08, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.