U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00721-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RICHARDSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 19, 2022: [Access]
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • September 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 01, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 17, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 29, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 29, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • April 29, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • April 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Proposed Order]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 24, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • January 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 12, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.