U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RONDON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • January 23, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 17, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 06, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Response to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 25, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 25, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Bond ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 10, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.