U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00717-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MITCHELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 23, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Joinder]
  • May 24, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2022: [.Order]
  • May 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 13, 2022: [Joinder]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.