U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00718-1
  • Case Name: USA v. POWELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 24, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • October 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • October 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
August, 2022
  • August 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order for Routine Processing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • December 16, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • December 16, 2021: [Statement of Offense]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.