U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00640-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FRANKLIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.