U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00720-1
  • Case Name: USA v. STECHER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 18, 2023: [Status Conference]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 22, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Indictment]
  • December 08, 2021: [Protective Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.