U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00687-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUXTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 15, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Errata]
  • December 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.