U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00715-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WATSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Exclude]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 26, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Vacate]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 11, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 10, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 10, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.