U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00724-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 04, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [Indictment]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 24, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 24, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • January 13, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • January 11, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 10, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • January 07, 2022: [Stay]
  • January 07, 2022: [Review]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 10, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.