U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00725-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KASTNER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 18, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Filing Trial Exhibits Introduced Into Evidence]
  • January 09, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 21, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2022
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 21, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 13, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Status Report]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2022: [.Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • September 05, 2022: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Clarify]
  • August 30, 2022: [Clarify]
  • August 30, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • August 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • August 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 27, 2022: [Convert Hearing]
  • August 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 22, 2022: [Status Report]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Status Report]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • May 07, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • May 02, 2022: [Response to motion]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 18, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 18, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 17, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • February 17, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 04, 2022: [Reply to Opposition]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 21, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • December 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.