U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00723-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WORKMAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • October 14, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 03, 2022: [In Limine ]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Exclude]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • December 14, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Indictment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.