U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00726-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KENYON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 14, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 14, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • September 14, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.