U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00133-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LORENZANA-CORDON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.