U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00158
  • Case Name: IN RE: EXTRADITION APPLICATION TO THE KINGDOM OF THE NETHERLANDS, OF SEPTEMBER 10, 2021
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 02, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Take Judicial Notice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • February 17, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • February 10, 2022: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • February 09, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 31, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 29, 2022: [Take Judicial Notice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • December 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • December 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.