U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00155
  • Case Name: PRESS COALITIONS MOTION FOR ACCESS TO COMMUNITY SERVICE RECORDS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 26, 2022: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • January 04, 2022: [Response to motion]
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 14, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.