U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00731-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIGAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Indictment]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 30, 2024: [Dismiss Case]
  • September 30, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [In Limine ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • February 25, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • February 15, 2022: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 14, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 14, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.