U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00730-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACANDREW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Court Verdict ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 17, 2023: [Findings of Fact]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Bench Trial - Held]
  • January 10, 2023: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 07, 2023: [Exhibit List ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Stipulation]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • December 16, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 16, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • December 07, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response to motion]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • November 15, 2022: [Compel]
  • November 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Change Venue]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Information - Felony]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 19, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.