U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00732-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OLD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Leave to File Review]
  • April 24, 2025: [Request for Leave to File Review]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [.Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [.Order]
  • April 06, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [.Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Arraignment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 22, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Convert Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.