U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00733-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAOUCHE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 25, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Information - Felony]
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 19, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 19, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.