U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00691-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MACCRACKEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Indict]
  • January 13, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to Indict]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.