U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00734-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DROPKIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 12, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • July 12, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • December 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • December 14, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 14, 2021: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.