U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00689-2
  • Case Name: USA v. GIDDINGS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 20, 2022: [Exclude]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.