U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00686-2
  • Case Name: USA v. HAZARD et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 08, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 08, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • March 05, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 05, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • March 05, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • March 04, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • March 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 03, 2022: [.Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 02, 2022: [Errata]
  • March 02, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 02, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 02, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 02, 2022: [Stay]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 20, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 07, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.