U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00737-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HUBBARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 17, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 15, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 14, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 16, 2021: [Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 15, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 15, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.