U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00736-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MAZZA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • October 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • September 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 17, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • June 17, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Courtroom Change]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 24, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.