U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00738-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OLIVERAS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 04, 2024: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Sentencing]
  • October 03, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 30, 2024: [Dismiss Count(s)]
  • September 26, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
  • January 18, 2023: [Waiver]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 17, 2023: [.Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum Opinion ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Error]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Convert Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response to motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • January 03, 2023: [Convert Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • November 16, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • November 03, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • November 03, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • November 03, 2022: [Dismiss Count(s)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • October 27, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 26, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 24, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • December 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.