U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00696-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • February 18, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • February 17, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 02, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 02, 2022: [Protective Order ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2022: [Seal Case]
  • January 11, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.