U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00694-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JENKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 17, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.