U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00157
  • Case Name: In re SUBPOENA OF AT&T BY AUTHORITY OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • February 01, 2022: [Withdraw]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney]
  • January 10, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.