U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00735-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ELLIOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue ]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
  • November 03, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2022: [Travel ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 06, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 21, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.