U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00741-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEBLER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 01, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 20, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Disclosure ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.