U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00739-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BUXTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • December 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 28, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • November 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 10, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • August 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Stop]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Disclosure ]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.