U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00699-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TAYLOR
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 07, 2022: [.Order]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice of QC]
  • April 14, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 07, 2022: [Status Conference]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • December 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.