U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00700-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BANIRE et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 11, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 07, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 27, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 26, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
  • December 22, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.