U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cr-00225-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EL KHEBKI et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [.Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 15, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 14, 2022: [.Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 13, 2022: [Continue ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 31, 2022: [.Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [.Order]
  • August 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • June 16, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • June 14, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • April 21, 2022: [.Order]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Supplement to any document]
February, 2022
  • February 21, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • February 14, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [.Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Revoke]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 21, 2022: [Protective Order ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • January 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 03, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • January 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • January 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • January 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.