U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00695-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KING
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appear]
  • April 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • April 07, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • April 06, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Review]
  • April 01, 2022: [Status Conference]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Reconsideration ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 14, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Exclude]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Transcript]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 23, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • December 23, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Medical/Mental Health Alert]
  • December 23, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 23, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.