U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00743-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CONOVER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Access]
  • June 10, 2022: [Probation Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Reply in Support]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Access]
  • May 03, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Errata]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • April 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 07, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 07, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 07, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Standing Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.