U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00745-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BALLARD
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • July 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 15, 2022: [Waiver of Trial by Jury]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 03, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 03, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2022: [Bond Set/Reset]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Standing Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Protective Order ]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.