U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00744-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PETTIT et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Probation Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 20, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 10, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 10, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 10, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • December 27, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.