U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00166
  • Case Name: PRESS COALITIONS MOTION FOR ACCESS TO COMMUNITY SERVICE RECORDS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Authorization Order]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Authorization Order]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • January 04, 2022: [Filing Fee Received]
  • January 04, 2022: [Reply to opposition to motion]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Memorandum in opposition to motion]
  • December 27, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • December 27, 2021: [Motion for Authorization Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.