U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00748-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MERRY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status]
  • April 12, 2022: [Modify]
  • April 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons (DO NOT UNSEAL)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Statement of Offense]
  • January 05, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
  • January 05, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 05, 2022: [Referred for PSI Report]
  • January 05, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2022: [.Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.